Financial history BRITISH EXPLORING SOCIETY

Charity number: 802196
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022
Total gross income £1.58m £1.76m £1.28m £1.26m £1.57m
Total expenditure £1.63m £1.82m £904.88k £1.18m £1.62m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £891.63k £750.67k £1.02m £674.65k £952.83k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £676.22k £1.01m £149.29k £580.12k £615.85k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £125 £125 £310
Income - Investment £689 £1.87k £914 £80 £1.19k
Income - Other £7.51k £1.29k £107.51k £519 £1.24k
Income - Legacies £0 £8.37k £20.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.40m £1.81m £899.20k £1.17m £1.62m
Expenditure - Raising funds £49.44k £10.71k £5.68k £7.63k £0
Expenditure - Governance £43.35k £46.93k £63.20k £71.73k £82.95k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £176.27k £0 £0 £0 £0