Accounts and annual returns ST PETER AND ST PAUL PARENTS TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 802359
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 25 April 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 20 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 04 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 13 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required