Financial history ST PETER AND ST PAUL PARENTS TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 802359
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £8.15k £8.80k £9.54k £912 £14.27k
Total expenditure £9.32k £10.76k £10.37k £1.99k £6.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A