THE MAIDSTONE MUSEUMS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 802547
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £34.13k £8.70k £5.73k £6.15k £7.43k
Total expenditure £3.54k £43.50k £5.46k £5.51k £4.47k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A