THE MAIDSTONE MUSEUMS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 802547
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARK BAKER Chair None on record
WILLIAM STOTESBURY Trustee 13 December 2018 None on record
MICHAEL EVANS Trustee 06 February 2014 None on record
MARTIN ROUND Trustee 01 July 2021 None on record
IVAN WHITE Trustee 29 June 2012 None on record
STEPHEN FARRANT Trustee None on record
JANETTE LLOYD Trustee 22 June 2018 None on record
SIMON WEBB Trustee 01 July 2021 None on record
MR TREVOR STUGESS Trustee 01 November 2013 None on record
FRANCES WILSON Trustee 09 May 2019 None on record
Marianne Webb Trustee 10 June 2021
SWITCH YOUTH SERVICES Received: On time
MAIDSTONE TOWN CENTRE YOUTH CAFE Received: On time