THE STOWMARKET CHURCH CHARITY

Charity number: 802571
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £21.86k £22.15k £22.43k £22.68k £21.75k
Total expenditure £22.01k £22.06k £22.06k £22.06k £16.54k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A