Financial history ST JOHN PAYNE SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 802902
Charity reporting is overdue by 21 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £2.69k £7.70k £3.16k £4.20k £11.21k
Total expenditure £859 £6.74k £391 £1.12k £10.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A