COLLEGE FOR HIGHER RABBINICAL STUDIES

Charity number: 803466
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £625.90k £632.86k £772.97k £990.92k £992.08k
Total expenditure £564.75k £623.84k £631.73k £856.13k £1.55m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £592.10k £0 £715.49k £925.32k £932.35k
Income - Other trading activities £33.80k £0 £57.48k £65.60k £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £585.06k £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £47.80k £0 £0 £59.74k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £560.96k £620.14k £626.75k £856.13k £1.55m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £270 £3.49k £370 £250 £820
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £616.65k £301.68k £855.88k £1.51m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £3.52k £3.70k £3.65k £0 £0