Trustees WORLDSHARE

Charity number: 803575
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr KEVIN ROBERT MCKEMEY Chair
CHURCH MISSION SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE SOUTH AMERICAN MISSION SOCIETY
Received: On time
Daniel Ukiomogbe Trustee 26 April 2022
None on record
Neil John Brighton Trustee 10 March 2022
None on record
Rev Zoltan Biro Trustee 10 December 2020
None on record
Peter Anthony Summerside Trustee 10 December 2020
None on record
ANTHONY CLAUDE FISHER Trustee 21 September 2017
SWANFIELD CHAPEL
Received: On time
JOHN BUNCE Trustee 22 June 2017
None on record