THE CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF ARBITRATORS

Charity number: 803725
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Marion Smith Trustee 01 January 2017 None on record
Professor Doctor Mohamed Abdel Wahab Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record
Paul Barrett Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record
Dr David Muigua Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record
Caroline Kenny QC Trustee 01 January 2021 None on record
Andrew Miller QC Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record
Lucy Greenwood Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record
Richard Barnes Trustee 01 January 2021 None on record
Arran Dowling Hussey Trustee 01 January 2017 None on record
Dr Theophile Margellos Trustee 01 January 2021 None on record
JONATHAN WOOD Chair 01 January 2015 None on record
David Huenber Trustee 05 March 2020 None on record