THE SOCIETY OF THE GUILDFORD SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 803751
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £34.20k £36.97k £39.12k £42.93k £41.90k
Total expenditure £38.26k £37.82k £38.41k £48.18k £30.64k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A