1ST ESHER FRIENDS OF GUIDING

Charity number: 810118
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £14.86k £16.04k £15.29k £33.63k £18.16k
Total expenditure £5.03k £8.77k £7.19k £35.02k £17.15k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £16.26k £10.00k