ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES OF JAMES SOUTH AND WILLIAM BURBERRY

Charity number: 810227
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £78.58k £83.21k £84.43k £87.81k £91.89k
Total expenditure £53.31k £42.74k £38.54k £48.61k £64.28k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A