THE FRIENDS OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST CHURCH, KEYNSHAM

Charity number: 900401
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £2.50k £4.16k £1.50k £1.41k £3.22k
Total expenditure £3.28k £3.21k £3.37k £1.97k £1.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A