GLOUCESTER LAW CENTRE

Charity number: 900439
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 06 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 30 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 04 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

04 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 16 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

16 August 2016 On time Download