Accounts and annual returns COURT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (TUFFLEY)

Charity number: 900515
Charity reporting is overdue by 590 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 225 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 225 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 21 November 2022 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 590 days
Annual return 31 January 2021 16 December 2021 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 29 March 2021 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 06 January 2020 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required