THE RAILWAY CHILDREN

Charity number: 1058991
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 16 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 16 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 21 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 21 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2017 15 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 15 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2016 12 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 12 January 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2015 09 December 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2015 04 January 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)