ROBERT BARKER OR THE BRIDGE HOUSE TRUST (ESTATE TRUSTEES)

Charity number: 202808
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 23 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 09 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 09 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 22 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 22 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 06 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

( These accounts
have been qualified)

06 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 28 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 28 October 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)