DEAFINITELY INDEPENDENT

Charity number: 1027567
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 26 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 26 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 12 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 12 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 04 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 04 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 19 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 10 October 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)