UZIMA IN OUR HANDS

Charity number: 1153181
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 03 June 2020 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 03 June 2020 3 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 26 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 26 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 11 June 2018 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017

( These accounts
have been qualified)

11 June 2018 11 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 04 July 2017 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016

( These accounts
have been qualified)

04 July 2017 34 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2015 05 February 2017 250 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2015 06 February 2017 251 days late Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)