CANBURY PARK CHURCH TRUST

Charity number: 1146287
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
21/09/2015 22/09/2016 22/09/2017 22/09/2018 22/09/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £137.26k £60.94k £508.08k £303.43k £77.43k
Total expenditure £70.58k £72.68k £86.10k £98.12k £163.57k