GOVERNORS OF THE CHARITY FOR RELIEF OF THE POOR WIDOWS AND CHILDREN OF CLERGYMEN (COMMONLY CALLED CLERGY SUPPORT TRUST)

Charity number: 207736
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £3,388,714 £4,177,820 £3,960,071 £4,682,314 £4,272,902
Total expenditure £3,390,220 £3,459,401 £3,674,160 £3,995,125 £4,344,187