KRISHNAMURTI FOUNDATION TRUST LTD

Charity number: 312865
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/07/2015 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £19.84k £25.18k £27.34k £15.20k
Other income £2.27m £2.06m £1.87m £2.35m £2.29m
Total expenditure £2.02m £1.97m £1.90m £2.03m £2.19m