HINDU SAMAJ SWINDON

Charity number: 1108534
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/07/2015 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019
Income from government contracts £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Other income £11,173 £8,893 £10,374 £11,787 £13,578
Total expenditure £11,858 £9,323 £9,229 £11,634 £17,837