ARTS GATEWAY MK

Charity number: 1126872
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4,000 £500 £16,200 £16,000 £33,000
Other income £73,570 £97,385 £75,675 £91,593 £95,724
Total expenditure £68,067 £80,552 £102,476 £90,864 £147,176