COTSWOLD DOWNS SYNDROME GROUP

Charity number: 1134341
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £18,101 £10,733 £18,533 £6,799 £17,095
Total expenditure £14,864 £8,668 £19,619 £6,769 £9,723