REIGATE PARK UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY

Charity number: 1130103
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £13,250 £0 N/A
Other income £145,725 £163,850 £148,460 £150,462 £259,477
Total expenditure £192,925 £148,267 £175,250 £151,923 £163,624