EALING SOUP KITCHEN

Charity number: 1152247
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £27,131 £29,941 £49,169 £30,742 £70,777
Total expenditure £22,413 £28,751 £30,218 £45,395 £31,647