BOXING4LIFE

Charity number: 1155607
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Income from government contracts £2,180 £1,375 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1,900 £3,498 £5,965 £2,300 £2,450
Other income £22,094 £29,466 £29,176 £37,295 £23,127
Total expenditure £23,978 £33,540 £28,676 £39,235 £22,474