GOVERNORS OF THE CHARITY FOR RELIEF OF THE POOR WIDOWS AND CHILDREN OF CLERGYMEN (COMMONLY CALLED CLERGY SUPPORT TRUST)

Charity number: 207736
Charity reporting is up to date
Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 17 DECEMBER 1957 AS CONFIRMED BY ACT OF 14 MAY 1958 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 21 DECEMBER 1960 3 FEBRUARY 1971 20 MARCH 1974 AND 18 NOVEMBER 1976
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF TEN CURATES IN ENGLAND AND WALES WHOSE INCOME DOES NOT EXCEED ú40 PER ANNUM, PREFERECE GIVEN TO THOSE WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN MARRIED
Area of benefit
Registration history
  • 24 April 1963 : registered
  • 27 January 1995 : removed