KRISHNAMURTI FOUNDATION TRUST LTD

Charity number: 312865
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gisele Balleys Trustee 02 November 2001 None on record
Derek Hook Trustee 02 March 1997 None on record
Wendy Smith Trustee 08 September 2011 None on record
Alistair Cavan Herron Trustee 04 November 2016 None on record
Gary Primrose Chair 01 November 2009 None on record