Governing document Forest School, London
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 FEBRUARY 1947 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 2 JULY 1964 AND 17 OCTOBER 1986 as amended on 04 Jan 2022 as amended on 30 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROVIDE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND IN CONNECTION THEREWITH TO ESTABLISH AND PROVIDE, CONDUCT, CARRY ON, ACQUIRE AND DEVELOP IN THE UNITED KINGDOM ANY BOARDING OR DAY SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS FOR THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.