Accounts and annual returns SHUTTLEWORTH CHARITY FOR THE POOR
Charity number: 200144
Charity reporting is overdue by 990 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 260 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 260 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 625 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 625 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 990 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 990 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 March 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 05 March 2020 | 126 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window