Trustees DUTTON'S AND ALLEN'S ALMSHOUSES
Charity number: 203546
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Owen | Chair | 13 January 2017 |
|
|||||||||||||
Patricia Lesley Holroyd | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||
Julia Caveller | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||
Emily Hartnell | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||
Michael Chappin | Trustee | 13 January 2017 |
|
|||||||||||||
CHRISTOPHER HANCOCK | Trustee | 03 August 2011 |
|
|||||||||||||
JACQUES JEAN MARCEL ASTIC | Trustee | 03 August 2011 |
|
|||||||||||||
THOMAS DUNCAN STEVENS | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||||
JOHN ADRIAN LAWRENCE | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||||
David Melville Louisson | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||||
WILLIAM JOHN MUSTOE | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||||
SIMON CHRISTOPHER BARNARD WILLS | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.