Trustees SPALDING GENTLEMEN'S SOCIETY
Charity number: 216131
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Alan James Gratton | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Patrick James Wensor | Trustee | 20 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Armstrong Dobbs | Trustee | 29 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
MELVYN PRICE | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr Michael Gilbert | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Graham DAYES | Trustee | 03 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Petronella Gerarda Keeling | Trustee | 03 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH JANE SNEATH | Trustee | 29 April 2016 |
|
|||||
Dr Dustin McKinley Frazier Wood | Trustee | 24 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Ian Hoult | Trustee | 25 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
MR TOM GRIMES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.