Trustees THE LONDON WILDLIFE TRUST
Charity number: 283895
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shara Samra | Trustee | 30 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Stephen | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Starling | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Richardson | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kapila Perera | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Fox | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr STEPHEN PAUL SNAITH | Trustee | 29 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rufus Radcliffe | Trustee | 23 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Crompton Tweddle | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.