Trustees STORMONT SCHOOL
Charity number: 311079
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Henrietta Celia Hodgkiss | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Richardson | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Ruth Craig | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gary Mahoney | Trustee | 15 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
DR SOPHIE HARRIET PATTISON | Trustee | 05 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sophie Pattison | Trustee | 05 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr ALISON FRANCES RITCHIE | Trustee | 22 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JAMES NEWLAND | Trustee | 04 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
CAROLYN GEDYE | Trustee | 10 November 2009 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.