Trustees ETAL GROUP RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1074133
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pauline Jane Hall | Chair | 14 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christine Harding | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Ready | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Phipps | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen Newlands | Trustee | 26 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOYCE STEVENS | Trustee | 26 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
MRS SUE WADE | Trustee | 26 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Elizabeth Mary Roddam | Trustee | 27 January 2004 |
|
|
||||
MRS DIANA SLEE | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.