Trustees ASYLUM JUSTICE
Charity number: 1112026
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Bernadette Ann RAINEY | Chair | 19 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Kate Toner-Bass | Trustee | 22 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joseff Morgan | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Godwin | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Holly Taylor | Trustee | 28 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Baker | Trustee | 10 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Goodban | Trustee | 08 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Femmigje Chater | Trustee | 23 June 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.