Trustees ART REFUGE
Charity number: 1114353
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Ravi Kohli | Chair | 21 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Shafiqullah Noori | Trustee | 21 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANNA JANE CASTLETON SIMMONS | Trustee | 12 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Michael Richards | Trustee | 12 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Kathleen Greatorex | Trustee | 13 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Claire Xiaochi Zhang | Trustee | 27 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Polly Bagnall | Trustee | 26 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Cronin Dr | Trustee | 25 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Chris Wood | Trustee | 04 June 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.