Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF TAMWORTH
Charity number: 1133982
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Andrew Simon Lythall | Chair | 09 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Desmond Richard Booth | Trustee | 30 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Goldsworthy | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Jane Pratt | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANN NICHOLLS | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Biggs | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Yvonne Palin | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan William James Newbold | Trustee | 06 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Walker | Trustee | 19 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Farrell | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Frederick Mulvey | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Leah Denise Sandford | Trustee | 08 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Keith Raymond Dawson | Trustee | 08 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christine Simpson | Trustee | 23 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN ROSE | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Briony Brookman | Trustee | 27 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Gwen Louise Wilkinson | Trustee |
|
||||||
NEIL MARTIN WILLIAM BRADLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VIVIAN ATTWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ISOBEL CAROLINE GIBSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JULIAN EDWARD COTTERILL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.