Governing document NETWORK FOR ANIMALS CHARITABLE TRUST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21/09/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/06/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23/06/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 06/09/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 20/08/2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE WELFARE AND CONSERVATION OF ANIMALS THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY REDUCING COMMERCIAL EXPLOITATION OF ANIMALS, HELPING ANIMALS IN CRISIS AND DISTRESS, WORKING TO PREVENT CRUELTY TO WILD AND DOMESTIC ANIMALS AND TO EDUCATE POLICY MAKERS AND THE PUBLIC IN RESPECT OF THE FOREGOING IN SUCH WAYS AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.