Trustees READING UNIVERSITY STUDENTS' UNION
Charity number: 1158523
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shreyas GANDHI | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emmanuel Olaoluwa ADEYEYE | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Madison Rundle | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Louis Gregory HAXELL | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nathan Harry NORRIS | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eghoghon Sarah IFIDON | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mx Gwyneth James | Trustee | 24 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mike Phillipps | Trustee | 19 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Debra Mary Soper | Trustee | 26 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Tim Bertram | Trustee | 26 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Ellison | Trustee | 26 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jack Edward Maddock | Trustee | 15 October 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.