Trustees THE WATLINGTON CLUB CIO
Charity number: 1160612
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev ANGIE PATERSON | Chair | 09 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Adam James Beveridge | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neville Smith | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Norton | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Peregrine Heathcote | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES EALES | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christy Louise King | Trustee | 16 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Brook | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.