Trustees HAMPSHIRE SEARCH AND RESCUE
Charity number: 1174085
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP EDWARD HARVEY | Chair | 08 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alison Margaret Chestnutt | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Richard Cook | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Frances Ann Hardy | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Marie Smedley | Trustee | 05 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ben William Goddard | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Hayward Baker | Trustee | 07 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR HALFACRE VIDLER | Trustee | 08 March 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.