Trustees AASHA ENGLAND
Charity number: 1179464
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr SIVASUNDAR LAL RAJESH | Chair | 15 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
Nidhi Bindal Dhir | Trustee | 10 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Natarajan Saravanappa | Trustee | 11 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr VISHNU MACHINENI | Trustee | 15 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
SANDEEP KONDURU | Trustee | 15 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr VASANTHAPRIYA SELVARAJ | Trustee | 21 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
VEERA RAGHAVAN GUDIMETLA | Trustee | 26 April 2008 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.