Trustees ABERYSTWYTH AND DISTRICT STROKE CLUB
Charity number: 519695
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AMY YATES SOCIAL SEC | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Valmai Griffiths | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
RUTH DAVIES | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
MARY EVANS | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE MYFANWY JAMES | Trustee | 22 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
JEN JONES | Trustee | 22 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
LYNDA JOY LLOYD TREASURER | Trustee | 23 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Byron Jones | Trustee | 28 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
SYLVIA MADELINE JENKINS SECRETARY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AUDREY EVANS President | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LUCINDA ELIZABETH THOMAS chair | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.