ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST CHARITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objective of the charity is that the funds are made available to benefit the patients and staff of Essex Partnership University NHS Foundation Trust, or for any other NHS organisation on behalf of whom the Trust administers funds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bedford
- Essex
- Thurrock
Governance
- 05 March 2003: Standard registration
- 26 June 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
- SEPT GENERAL CHARITABLE FUND (Working name)
- ESSEX PARTNERSHIP NHS FOUNDATION TRUST CHARITIES (Previous name)
- SOUTH ESSEX PARTNERSHIP NHS FOUNDATION TRUST CHARITIES (Previous name)
- SOUTH ESSEX PARTNERSHIP NHS TRUST CHARITIES (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THE BOARD OF ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £209.00k | £237.00k | £119.00k | £68.77k | £98.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £179.00k | £259.00k | £95.00k | £92.74k | £110.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SEE INDIVIDUAL CONSTITUENTS as amended on 28 Feb 2018 as amended on 12 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
SEE INDIVIDUAL CONSTITUENTS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- BASIL BEAR FUND
- BRENTWOOD SERVICES FUND
- CANCER RELIEF FUND
- CHILDRENS CENTRE FUND
- CONTINENCE CARE FUND
- CONTINUING CARE SERVICES FUND
- DEPARTMENT OF NUTRITION AND DIETETICS FUND
- DIABETIC CARE CENTRE
- DISTRICT NURSES FUND
- ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST BEDS CHILDS HELATH DIRECTORATE FUND
- ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST CANCER CARE GENERAL FUND -
- ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST COMMUNITY SERVICE FUND -
- ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST GENERAL CHARITABLE FUND
- ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST GENERAL FUND
- ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST MENTAL HEALTH GENERAL FUND
- ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST STAFF WELFARE
- HEALTH CENTRE AND CLINICS FUND
- HENRICUS OCTAVIUS ROE IN CONNECTION WITH FAIRFIELD HOSPITAL, ARLESEY
- LEARNING DISABILITY CHARITY
- LEARNING DISABLILITIES PSYCHIATRY ACADEMIC AND RESEARCH FOUNDATION
- MENTAL HEALTH CHARITY
- MENTAL HEALTH RESEARCH FOUNDATION
- PHYSIOTHERAPY SERVICES FUND
- PRIMARY CARE CHARITY
- PRIMARY CARE TRUST GENERAL PURPOSE FUND
- PRIMARY CARE TRUST STAFF WELFARE FUND
- PSYCHIATRIC RESEARCH FUND
- PSYCHOLOGY SERVICES FUND
- SOUTH BEDFORDSHIRE COMMUNITY HEALTH FAIRFIELD HOSPITAL GENERAL
- SOUTH BEDFORDSHIRE COMMUNITY HEALTH FAIRFIELD HOSPITAL PATIENTS WELFARE
- SOUTH BEDFORDSHIRE COMMUNITY HEALTH FAIRFIELD HOSPITAL STAFF WELFARE
- SOUTH BEDFORDSHIRE COMMUNITY HEALTH FARINGDON WING
- SOUTH BEDFORDSHIRE COMMUNITY HEALTH FARINGDON WING PATIENTS WELFARE
- SOUTH BEDFORDSHIRE COMMUNITY HEALTH MENTAL HEALTH GENERAL
- SOUTH BEDFORDSHIRE COMMUNITY HEALTH MENTAL HEALTH PATIENTS AND STAFF WELFARE
- SOUTH BEDFORDSHIRE COMMUNITY HEALTH MENTAL HEALTH PATIENTS WELFARE
- SOUTH ESSEX PARTNERSHIP NHS TRUST (EXPENDABLE FUNDS) COMMON INVESTMENT FUND
- SOUTH ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST (EXPENDABLE FUNDS) COMMON INVESTMENT FUND
- SOUTH ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST AMPTHILL AND DISTRICT GENERAL FUND
- SOUTH ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST BEDS RURAL GENERAL FUND
- SOUTH ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST BEDS URBAN GENERAL FUND
- SOUTH ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST BIGGLESWADE AND DISTRICT GENERAL FUND
- SOUTH ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST CHARITABLE FUND
- SOUTH ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST LEARNING DISABILITIES GENERAL FUND
- SOUTH ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST MENTAL HEALTH TRAINING/EQUIPMENT FUND
- SOUTH ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST OTHER LOCALITY SERVICES GENERAL FUND
- SOUTH ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST PATIENTS WELFARE FUND
- SOUTH ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST VERANDAH PROJECT FUND
- SPEECH AND LANGUAGE THERAPY FUND
- THE MARGARET ETHEL BOLTON FUND
- 05 March 2003 : Standard registration
- 26 June 2017 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
Thurrock Community Hospital
Thameside House
Long Lane
Grays
Essex
RM162PX
- Phone:
- 07974769872
- Email:
- c.barley@nhs.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window