Accounts and annual returns TARALOKA

Charity number: 274500
Charity reporting is up to date (25 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 21 November 2024 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 25 November 2024 25 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 20 February 2024 112 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 20 February 2024 112 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 03 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window