Financial history TARALOKA

Charity Number: 274500
Charity reporting is up to date (25 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £448.54k £234.22k £252.62k £363.84k £377.93k
Total expenditure £311.78k £241.65k £258.32k £314.71k £376.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A